+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0138)
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 138 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 29, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 20, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB341ER)
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 1-N)
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 967190364-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Read second time
On January 29, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 26, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 24, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/amds. (21-Y 1-N)
On January 15, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 967190364
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1996: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 1-N)
January 23, 1996: Reported from Tra. w/amds. (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor