+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N)
- Read third time and passed House (54-Y 45-N)
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB340H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22105271D-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22105271D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100598D