+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 11, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0454)
On April 8, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 454 (effective 7/1/94)
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation received by House
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR GOV. RECOMMEND. (37-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB339ER)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 3-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD4043176 (HB339E)
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reported from Appropriations with amd. (22-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3/4
On January 20, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed