+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Left in Education and Health
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (12-Y 3-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 36-N)
- Read third time and passed House (64-Y 36-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute from Rules rejected 18106104D-H1
- Read second time
- Committee substitute from Appropriations agreed to 18107013D-H2
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB338H2
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18107013D-H2
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 18106104D-H1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 3-N)
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102781D