+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 in Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (85-Y 14-N)
- Read third time and passed House (85-Y 14-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB333H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20106980D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 20106980D-H1
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 1, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102076D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 17, 2020: Continued to 2021 in Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 5, 2020: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 14-N)
January 30, 2020: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
January 28, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Paul E. Krizek
Type:
Primary Sponsor