+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 in Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (95-Y 5-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 5-N)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
- Passed by temporarily
- Floor substitute printed 20108096D-H2 (Hope)
- Read second time
- Committee on Education amendments rejected
- Committee on Appropriations substitute rejected 20107911D-H1
- Substitute by Delegate Hope agreed to 20108096D-H2
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB332H2
On February 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 20107911D-H1
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ
On January 1, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103248D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
February 27, 2020: Continued to 2021 in Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 11, 2020: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 5-N)
February 7, 2020: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2020: Reported from Education with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Patrick A. Hope
Type:
Primary Sponsor