+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N)
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N)
On January 13, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102924D