+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 6, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 729 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB331ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (12-Y 4-N)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB331H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104599D-H1
- Read second time
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by until Monday, February 10, 2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14104599D-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Agriculture, Commerce, Technology and Natural Resources
On January 2, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102606D
+ − Votes (8)
February 27, 2014: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 27, 2014: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 27, 2014: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2014: Reported from Finance (12-Y 4-N)
February 11, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2014: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor