+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (8-Y 6-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105957D-H1
- Emergency clause added
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB330H1
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18105957D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103321D
+ − Votes (4)
February 22, 2018: Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (8-Y 6-N)
February 2, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor