+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0291)
On April 8, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 291 (effective 1/1/98)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB33ER)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 984364152-E
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd. (22-Y 1-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 14, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/19/97 984364152
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
February 3, 1998: Reported from Finance with amd. (22-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor