+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 512 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0512)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB329ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101465D
- Referred to Committee on Education
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2018: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor