+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 17, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0404)
On April 12, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 404 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB327ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 989593212-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 989593212-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 989593212-S1
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 987151212-E
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/amd. (24-Y 1-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 2
On January 27, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 987151212
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Transportation w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Tra. w/amd. (24-Y 1-N)
January 27, 1998: Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor