+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 17 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0017)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 26, 2018
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB326ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103258D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor