+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0010)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 10 (effective 7/1/22)
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2022
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2022
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB324ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (95-Y 5-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 5-N)
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102776D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2022: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2022: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2022: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 5-N)
January 31, 2022: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor