+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0317)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 317 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB323ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB323H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14103879D-H1
- Read second time
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by until Monday, February 10, 2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 14103879D-H1
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health
On January 2, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101548D
+ − Votes (6)
February 24, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2014: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor