+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1999 in Finance by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Substitute by Mr Cranwell agreed to 989696176-H2
- Committee substitute rejected 989687176-H1
- Engrossed by House - fl. sub. 989696176-H2 (Cranwell)
- Floor substitute printed 989696176-H2 (Cranwell)
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Passed by for the day
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 989687176-H1
- Reported from Finance with sub. (23-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 985986176
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (2)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance with sub. (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor