+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Stricken from House calendar
- Committee substitute rejected
- Constitutional readings dispensed
- Committee substitute printed LD7381198 (HB323H1)
- Reported from Finance with sub. (10-Y 9-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Read third time
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (46-Y 37-N)
- Read second time and engrossed (46-Y 37-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (8-Y 7-N)
On January 21, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 20, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (3)
February 15, 1994: Reported from Finance with sub. (10-Y 9-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (46-Y 37-N)
February 12, 1994: Reported from Finance (8-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor