+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned CT & I sub: Technology and Innovation
On December 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100246D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
January 27, 2020: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Hala S. Ayala
Type:
Primary Sponsor