+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0011)
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 11 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB319ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 21, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
On January 4, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083903476
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2008: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2008: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor