+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 27, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0601)
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 601 (effective 1/1/98)
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB318ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 3
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 988802432
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor