+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0693)
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 693 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB3171ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On February 24, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (88-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Landes, Hogan, Phillips
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senators: Stosch, Hawkins, Lambert
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (6-Y 90-N)
- Senate amendments rejected by House (6-Y 90-N)
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB3171H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 075888376-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 075888376-H1
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Higher Education (Morgan)
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed 075871376