+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0020)
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 20 (effective 7/1/04)
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB317ER)
On February 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N)
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB317H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 044798300-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 044798300-H1
- Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/04 047561300