+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 11, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0504)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 504 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB317ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 10105668D-S1 (98-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB317S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105668D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 10105668D-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Commerce and Labor
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 10104706D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB317H1
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10104706D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: #2
On January 11, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103709D
+ − Votes (9)
March 8, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2010: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2010: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2010: Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2010: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor