+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 3, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0364)
On April 1, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 364 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2002 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB317ER)
On February 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 023851772-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 023851772-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 023851772-H1
On January 21, 2002 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/02 024079772
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2002: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2002: Reported from Finance with sub (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor