+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0833)
On March 25, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 833 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB3141ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (37-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (35-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (13-Y 2-N)
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed 076555488
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: (37-Y 1-N)
February 15, 2007: VOTE: (35-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2007: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 2-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2007: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor