+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0535)
On March 19, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 535 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB3138ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 075422312-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB3138S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 075422312-S1
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed 074300116
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2007: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2007: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor