+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 28-N)
- Read third time and passed House (71-Y 28-N)
- Floor substitute printed 077154256-H2 (Byron)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
- Substitute by Delegate Byron withdrawn 077154256-H2
- Amendments by Delegate Byron agreed to
- Amendment by Delegate McEachin rejected (38-Y 55-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (38-Y 55-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB3130EH1
- Printed as engrossed 077150256-EH1
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to 077150256-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 077150256-H1
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 070234256
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 28-N)
February 5, 2007: VOTE: REJECTED (38-Y 55-N)
January 31, 2007: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor