+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 3, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0189)
On March 24, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 189 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB312ER)
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 8-N)
- Read third time and passed House (88-Y 8-N)
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Courts of Justice sub-committee: Civil Law
On January 4, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 066077204
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 8-N)
January 23, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor