+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0687)
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 687 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB3119ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (35-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 076532460-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB3119E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed 076532460
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2007: VOTE: (35-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2007: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2007: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor