+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (51)
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0891)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (91-Y 9-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 9-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 891 (effective 7/1/07)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB3114ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB3114ER)
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 076142276-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB3114S1
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Motion to reconsider Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 076142276-S1
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB3114H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 070929276-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 070929276-H1
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #4 Prof./Occup./Admin. (Cosgrove)
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 075734276