+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 11, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0406)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 406 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB311ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB311H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10104957D-H1
- Read second time
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10104957D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health
On January 11, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102553D
+ − Votes (7)
March 8, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2010: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2010: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2010: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor