+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 31, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0092)
On March 23, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 92 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB310ER)
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On January 4, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 063634492
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2006: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2006: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor