+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (60)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0883)
- Enacted, Chapter 883 (effective 7/1/94)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Amended as substitute by Governor's recommendation
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (97-Y 1-N)
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Governor's substitute printed LD9145812 (HB310H2)
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 22, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB310ER)
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
- Senate substitute accepted by conference committee
On March 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (36-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
- Passed by temporarily
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 1-N)
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senators: Colgan, Holland, E.M., Chichester
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Delegates: Clement, Bloxom, Moore
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (0-Y 99-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute
- Floor substitute printed LD9118695 (HB310S1)
- Substitute by Sen. Lucas agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read second time
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD7935152 (HB310H1)
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (11)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
March 11, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (36-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
February 28, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1994: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor