+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0207)
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 207 (effective 3/3/08)
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB31ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Capital Outlay (Ingram)
On January 8, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/09/08 082861818
+ − Votes (7)
February 21, 2008: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2008: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2008: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2008: Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor