+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 21, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0473)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 473 (effective 4/14/98)
On March 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB31ER)
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (93-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (93-Y 6-N)
- Title replaced
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (95-Y 3-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 987244809-E
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (28-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the House:
- Pres. & ord. printed w/emg. clause pref.12/19/97 987244809
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations