+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (64)
On May 20, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 965 (effective 5/20/94)
On April 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 28, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
On April 27, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: UNCONTESTED ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Governor withdrew recommendation # 5 & 8
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (97-Y 0-N))
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- House rejected Gov's recommendation # 2 (44-Y 55-N)
- VOTE: OBJECTED AMDT #2 ADOPTION (44-Y 55-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. REC. IN PART (39-Y 0-N)
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On April 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 7, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (40-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N)
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Delegates: Ball, Dickinson, Diamonstein, Callahan
- Conferees reappointed by House
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senators: Andrews, Walker, Colgan, Chichester
- Conferees reappointed by Senate
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Fin. w/amds. as sub. for Hou amds (15-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amds. as sub. for Hou amds (39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (38-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- Senate amendments rejected by House (1-Y 97-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Ball, Dickinson, Diamonstein, Callahan
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Andrews, Walker, Colgan, Chichester
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N)
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 24, 1994 in the House:
- Amendment by Del. Cranwell agreed to
- Read second time
- Uncontested Committee amendments agreed to
- Contested Committee amendment agreed to Item 1
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed (99-Y 0-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (95-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- Special and Continuning Order-12:30 p.m. 02/24/94
- Motion for Special and Continuing Order
- Read first time
On February 21, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/20/93
+ − Votes (13)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. REC. IN PART (39-Y 0-N)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: UNCONTESTED ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: OBJECTED AMDT #2 ADOPTION (44-Y 55-N)
March 12, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (40-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
March 1, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N)
March 1, 1994: VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
March 1, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
March 1, 1994: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (38-Y 0-N)
March 1, 1994: Reported from Fin. w/amds. as sub. for Hou amds (15-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
February 21, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor