+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 8, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 869 (effective 7/1/20)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0869)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB308ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: Adoption (59-Y 37-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (59-Y 37-N)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 2-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed by temporarily
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (60-Y 38-N)
- Read third time and passed House (60-Y 38-N)
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB308H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20106887D-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 8-N)
- Committee substitute printed 20106887D-H1
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
On December 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100877D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 26, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (59-Y 37-N)
February 24, 2020: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 2-N)
February 21, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2020: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2020: VOTE: Passage (60-Y 38-N)
January 29, 2020: Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 8-N)
January 27, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Patrick A. Hope
Type:
Primary Sponsor