+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 18, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0859)
On April 9, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 859 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB306ER)
On March 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 964448202-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 964448202-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 964448202-H1
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On January 11, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 964135202
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 1996: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1996: Reported from General Laws with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor