+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance
On February 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/amd. (8-Y 6-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (82-Y 16-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD1715158 (HB305E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from R. & I. N. w/amd. (13-Y 8-N)
On January 26, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to R. & I. N. sub-committee: 4
On January 19, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 18, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1994: Reported from Transportation w/amd. (8-Y 6-N)
February 4, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N)
February 1, 1994: Reported from R. & I. N. w/amd. (13-Y 8-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor