+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 299 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0299)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB304ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107537D-S1 (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107537D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB304S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107537D-S1
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102744D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
+ − Votes (7)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2018: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
February 2, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor