+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 398 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0398)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB303ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y -0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102715D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice