+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (5-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions
On January 20, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Referred from Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote
On December 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101940D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Vote
January 29, 2020: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Patrick A. Hope
Type:
Primary Sponsor