+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0309)
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 309 (effective 3/12/07)
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB3017ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 070417105-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB3017E
- Emergency clause added
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement (Marshall, D.)
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 070417105