+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N)
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
- Assigned App. sub: Higher Education
- Incorporates HB811 (Miyares)
- Committee substitute printed 20106395D-H1
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed
On December 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100543D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 3, 2020: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N)
January 27, 2020: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
January 22, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Marcus B. Simon
Type:
Primary Sponsor