+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 14, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0623)
On April 10, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 623 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 30, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 28, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 21, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB3ER)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD0078827 (HB3E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 31, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/07/93 LD0078827