+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 1, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0678)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 678 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 31, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 27, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB299ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 985445450-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 985445450-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 985445450-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 1-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 987610450-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 987610450-H1
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 987610450-H2
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (24-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 987610450-H1
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Claims with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Claims sub-committee: 1
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 987599322
- Referred to Committee on Claims
+ − Votes (7)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 1-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (24-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1998: Reported from Claims with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor