+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 212 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB298ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 21, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On January 3, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088663532
+ − Votes (7)
February 21, 2008: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2008: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2008: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2008: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor