+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (3-Y 13-N 1-A)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 984478346-E
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (25-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Claims with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Claims sub-committee: 2
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 984478346
- Referred to Committee on Claims
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 1998: Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (3-Y 13-N 1-A)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (25-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1998: Reported from Claims with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor