+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 12, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0940)
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 940 (effective - see bill)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
- VOTE: ADOPTION (8-Y 90-N)
- House rejected Governor's recommendation (8-Y 90-N)
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2951ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 078138276
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 4, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (8-Y 90-N)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2007: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2007: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor