+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2019 in Local Government (7-Y 6-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB295E
- Printed as engrossed 18103592D-E
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (20-Y 2-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103592D
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns